CA AB51 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 141, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 21658.1 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: motorcycles: lane splitting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-04 - Assembly - AB 51 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB51 Quirk By Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 51 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 141, Statutes of 2016.
2016-08-19 Approved by the Governor.
2016-08-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2016-08-04AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5700.).
2016-08-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2016-08-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4729.).
2016-06-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-06-27SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-06-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2015-07-06SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-06-18SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2015-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 1619.)
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1540.)
2015-04-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 29).
2015-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-02-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2015-02-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2015-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2014-12-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2014-12-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code21658Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code21658.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_51&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_bill_20141201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_bill_20150211_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_bill_20150522_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_bill_20160601_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_bill_20160805_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_bill_20160819_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_vote_20150406_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_vote_20150429_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_vote_20150528_0934AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_vote_20160614_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_vote_20160801_0339PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_51_vote_20160804_0935AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback