CA AB508 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Section 685 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care practitioners: student loans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB508 Santiago By Pan (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 508 SANTIAGO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-01 Approved by the Governor.
2017-08-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2176.).
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1390.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-02-27AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and HIGHER ED.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code685Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback