CA AB508 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 234, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1463.012 to the Penal Code, relating to debt collection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Debt collection: homeless veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-19 - Assembly - AB 508 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB508 Ian Calderon By Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - AB 508 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 234, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-06 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
2013-08-19AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2579.).
2013-08-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1860.).
2013-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2013-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-15SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-02SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and RLS.
2013-04-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-04-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1041.)
2013-04-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2013-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-09AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2013-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2013-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2013-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1463.012New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_508&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20130409_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20130617_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20130823_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20130909_chaptered.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_bill_20130906_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_vote_20130402_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_vote_20130417_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_vote_20130422_1231PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_vote_20130514_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_vote_20130815_1155AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_508_vote_20130819_1232PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback