CA AB508 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-06 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1070 and 1071 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Displaced public transit, solid waste handling, and

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 508 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-06 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-06-23 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-08 Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2011-05-31 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-05-31 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 1666.)
2011-05-27 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-04 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-04-14 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-03-03 Referred to Com. on L. & E.
2011-02-16 From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2011-02-15 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1070Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1071Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback