CA AB508 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12814.8 to, and to add and repeal Section 12814.9 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: driver education: provisional licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2010-01-31 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2009-05-28 In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2009-04-29 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-04-16 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-15 Read second time and amended.
2009-04-14 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 13).
2009-03-16 Referred to Com. on TRANS.
2009-02-25 From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
2009-02-24 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code12814.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code12814.9Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback