CA AB503 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 729, 729.1, 729.2, 729.6, 729.8, 729.9, 730, 730.6, and 742.16 of, and to add Section 602.05 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Wards: probation.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Maria Durazo [D] |
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 503 Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB503 Stone et al. By Kamlager (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 503 Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - AB 503 Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB503 Stone et al. By Kamlager (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 503 Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - AB 503 Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 22.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13.). |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Kamlager. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1721.) (June 29). |
2021-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 22. Page 1072.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 1064.) |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Stone. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 22. Page 966.). |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 23). |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 602.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 729 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 729.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 729.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 729.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 729.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 729.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 730 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 730.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 742.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |