CA AB501 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1502 of, and to add Sections 1562.02 and 1562.03 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 5848.5 and 11462.01 of, and to add Section 11462.011 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health: community care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 501 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB501 Ridley-Thomas By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 501 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3287.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
2017-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2706.).
2017-09-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-06-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1977.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2017-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-27AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUM. S.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback