CA AB501 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 873, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 873, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 423.6 to the Government Code, relating to state emblems.
Title
State fabric.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Asm. Patty Lopez [D] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 501 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB501 Levine By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 501 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB501 Levine By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 501 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 873, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6544.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 6548.). |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4968.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3507.) |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and JUD. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 423.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 85285 | New Code | See Bill Text |