CA AB501 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 392, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 392, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25250.51 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 42950 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 12200, 12204, and 34601 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 501 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB501 Nazarian By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 501 NAZARIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB501 Nazarian By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 501 NAZARIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 392, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled measure version corrected. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3101.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2255.). |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1480.) |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25250.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42950 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 27314.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 34601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 34622 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10950 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10952 | Amended Code | Citation Text |