CA AB5 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 2.2 (commencing with Section 53.1) to Division 1 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 11135 of the Government Code, relating to homelessness.
Title
Homelessness.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23). |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2012-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 53.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 32228 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 354.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12944 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12993 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 868.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |