CA AB499 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 1569.47 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to referral sources.
Title
Referral source for residential care facilities for the elderly: duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 499 Blanca Rubio Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB499 Blanca Rubio et al. By Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 499 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB499 Blanca Rubio et al. By Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 499 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5218.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Caballero. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 13). |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1631.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1569.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |