CA AB498 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 625, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 625, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1797.5, 1930, and 1930.5 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Wildlife conservation: wildlife corridors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Assembly - AB 498 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB498 Levine By Pavley (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 498 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB498 Levine By Pavley (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 498 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 625, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 2910.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2407.). |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1621.) |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1541.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 6). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1797.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 1930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 1930.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |