CA AB498 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 672, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 672, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14105.27 and 14166.151 of, and to repeal Sections 14166.152, 14166.153, 14166.154, and 14166.155 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal.
Sponsors
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] |
Asm. Connie Conway [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB498 Ch (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 498 CHAVEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 498 CHAVEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 498 CHAVEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 498 CHAVEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 672, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3337.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (September 12). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3339.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3339.). |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2399.). |
2013-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, that the measure be re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1567.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |