CA AB495 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 12099.20) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 to the Government Code, relating to community investment.
Title
Community investment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 495 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 495 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 23). |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 3716.) |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 6). |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and H. & C.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12099 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12099.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12099.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |