CA AB491 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 772, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 772, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1255 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
General acute care hospitals: cardiac catheterization.
Sponsors
Asm. Martin Garrick [R] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] | Asm. Jeff Miller [R] | Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 491 MA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB491 Ma Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 491 PORTANTINO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB491 Ma Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 491 PORTANTINO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 772, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 31). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6787.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 6790.). | |
2012-08-31 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 5071.). | |
2012-08-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-29 | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 4945.) From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-08-28 | Joint Rule 61(b)(15) suspended. (Page 4911.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4911.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2012-08-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-23 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator La Malfa. | |
2012-08-09 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-06 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-07-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-06-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1636.) | |
2011-05-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-19 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-11 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-26 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 120889 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120990 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 123148 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1255 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 969.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |