CA AB491 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 594.9 to the Penal Code, relating to vandalism.
Title
Vandalism: political signs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 491 GARRICK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-16 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-02 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1443.) | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 21). | |
2009-04-20 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2009-02-25 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 594.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |