CA AB49 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
Pending: Assembly Accountability and Administrative Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6586.5, 6586.7, 8869.82, 8869.84, 8869.90, and 8869.94 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 11.8 (commencing with Section 8869.80) of Division 1 of Title 2 of, and to repeal and add Section 8869.83 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 50172, 50197.5, and 51505 of the Health and Safety Code, amend Section 89 of the Military and Veterans Code, and amend Sections 12206, 17058, and 23610.5 of the Revenue and Tax Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Debt Limit Allocation Committee: elimination and allocation of duties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and B. & F.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback