CA AB488 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5813.5, 5821, 5840, 5840.2, 5845, 5846, 5847, 5848, 5878.3, 5890, 5891, 5892, 5897, 5898, and 5899 of, to amend the heading of Part 3.7 (commencing with Section 5845) of Division 5 of, and to add Section 5841 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health services.
Title
Mental Health Services Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5813.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5821 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5840 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5840.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5841 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5845 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5846 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5847 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5848 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5878.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5890 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5891 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5892 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5897 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5898 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5899 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB488 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB488 |