CA AB488 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 42450.1) to Chapter 8 of Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recycling: household batteries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2014-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2013-05-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission.
2013-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-23AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 15).
2013-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2013-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code42450.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback