CA AB487 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6307 of the Water Code, relating to dams and reservoirs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Water Resources: dams and reservoirs: fees and penalty plus interest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 487 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1474.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2019-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code6267Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code6307Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback