CA AB486 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 666, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 666, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1703, 1909, 12501, 14022.3, 17406, 19301, 19302, 19306, 19320, 19320.5, 19321, 19322, 19323, 19324, 19325, 19326, 19330, 33004, 33501, 35028, 35143, 35253, 41601, 41608, 41840, 41962, 41976, 42238.5, 42639, 44843, 45113, 45301, 49180, 49430.7, 49534, 49556, 51796, 51796.2, 51797, 52500.1, 52501, 52501.5, 52502, 52505, 52511, 52515, 52517, 52523, 52540, 52552, 52570, 52572, 52610.5, 52616, 52616.4, 52616.18, 52653, 52656, 56333, and 84906 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 19300) of, and to amend the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 19300) of Chapter 7 of, Part 11 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to repeal Sections 41976.2, 41976.5, 46190, 46192, 46300.4, 52510, 52512, 52513, 52516, 52518, 52519, 52520, 52522, 52522.2, 52525, 52541, 52542, 52543, 52544, 52553, 52554, 52556, 52571, 52614, 52615, 52616.2, 52616.5, 52616.16, 52616.17, 52616.19, 52616.20, 52616.21, 52616.24, and 52617 of, and to repeal Article 5 (commencing with Section 46351) of Chapter 3 of Part 26 of, to repeal Article 11.5 (commencing with Section 49565) of Chapter 9 of Part 27 of, and to repeal Article 2 (commencing with Section 52530) of Chapter 10 of Part 28 of, Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 131052 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to elementary and secondary education.
Title
Elementary and secondary education: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 486 ED. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By O'DONNELL (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB486 ED. (O'Donnell) By Leyva (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 486 ED. Assembly Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB486 ED. (O'Donnell) By Leyva (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 486 ED. Assembly Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 666, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3040.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2507.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | From special consent calendar. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 9 corrected. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1604.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |