CA AB486 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 241, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 241, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4128, 4128.4, and 4128.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Centralized hospital packaging pharmacies: medication labels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB486 Bonilla By Block (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 486 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 486 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 241, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2049.). |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1447.). |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4128.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4128.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |