CA AB486 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 656, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 656, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11375.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Controlled substances.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-02 - Assembly - AB 486 HUESO Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB486 Hueso Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - AB 486 HUESO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB486 Hueso Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - AB 486 HUESO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 656, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2011-09-02 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2835.). | |
2011-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2138.). | |
2011-08-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-22 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-07-11 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-28 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-27 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-06-10 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-05-16 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1392.) | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-04-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53069.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11375.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |