CA AB484 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 574, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 574, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.076 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: probation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB484 Jones-Sawyer By Wiener (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 484 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 484 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 574, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2853.). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 4). |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 1249.) |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 19). |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.076 | Amended Code | Citation Text |