CA AB48 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12525.2 of the Government Code, and to add Sections 13652 and 13652.1 to the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: use of force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 48 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB48 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Gonzalez (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 48 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB48 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Gonzalez (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 48 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 19. Page 2920.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2338.). |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 19. Page 1716.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12525.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13652 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13652.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |