CA AB48 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14503, 15102, 15106, 15268, 15270, 17070.15, 17070.43, 17070.51, 17070.65, 17071.10, 17071.25, 17071.75, 17072.30, 17072.35, 17073.15, 17073.25, 17074.10, 17074.16, 17074.25, 17075.15, 17077.35, 17078.52, 17078.53, 17078.54, 17078.58, 17078.62, 17219, and 41024 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 17070.75 of, to add Sections 17070.415, 17070.54, 17070.56, 17070.57, 17070.59, and 17075.20 to, to add Article 10.7 (commencing with Section 17077.60) and Article 11.5 (commencing with Section 17078.40) to Chapter 12.5 of Part 10 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 89776) to Chapter 6 of Part 55 of Division 8 of Title 3 of, to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 92170) to Chapter 2 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of, to add Part 71 (commencing with Section 101200) to Division 14 of Title 3 of, to repeal Sections 17070.53, 17070.76, 17070.766, 17070.99, 17072.15, 17072.17, 17072.25, 17072.32, 17074.15, 17074.27, and 17078.66 of, and to repeal and add Section 17075.10 of, the Education Code, and to add Chapter 4.95 (commencing with Section 65998.5) and Chapter 4.97 (commencing with Section 65999) to Division 1 of Title 7 of the Government Code, relating to education finance, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of these funds.
Title
Education finance: school facilities: Public Preschool, K-12, and College Health and Safety Bond Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Assembly - AB 48 O'Donnell Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB48 O'Donnell et al (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 48 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB48 O'Donnell et al (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 48 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3617.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 13). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3575.) |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2934.). |
2019-09-12 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 12) |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2745.) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2691.) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3). |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1973.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |