CA AB479 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4660.1 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: permanent disability apportionment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 479 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB479 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Lara (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 479 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB479 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Lara (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 479 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6364.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5293.). |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Measure version as amended on May 21 corrected. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on INS. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and G.O. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 4660.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 32220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 32221.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6369 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6369.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |