CA AB474 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12201.02 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public social services: SSI/SSP.
Sponsors
Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Tony Thurmond [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Budget (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and BUDGET. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and HEALTH. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1432 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12201.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |