CA AB47 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12810.3 of the Vehicle Code, relating to driver’s licenses.
Title
Driver records: points: distracted driving.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Assembly - AB 47 Daly Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly iv class="statusCell"> (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB47 Daly By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 47 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly iv class="statusCell"> (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB47 Daly By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 47 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2943.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2281.). |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1916.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on January 23 corrected. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12810.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |