CA AB467 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2003 of the Fish and Game Code, to add Sections 5001.3, 6504, and 30615 to the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 682.7 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to use of state property.
Title
Competitions on state property: prize compensation: gender equity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - AB 467 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB467 Boerner Horvath et a By Leyva (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - AB 467 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB467 Boerner Horvath et a By Leyva (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - AB 467 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2791.). |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2199.). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1404.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 5001.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 6504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 682.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |