CA AB467 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 180203 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Local transportation authorities: transactions and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 467 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB467 Mullin By Hertzberg (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 467 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB467 Mullin By Hertzberg (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 467 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 3158.). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2456.). |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E. & C.A. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 1651.) |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 10). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E. & R. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 180203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |