CA AB461 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11322.82 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs: welfare-to-work: self-employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 461 Villapudua Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB461 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 461 Villapudua Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB461 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 461 Villapudua Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2843.). |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2389.). |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1726.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11322.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |