CA AB460 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 817, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19605 and 19614 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horse racing: satellite wagering facilities: fairs: funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 460 BIGELOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB460 Bigelow et al. By Glazer (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 460 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 817, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3385.).
2017-09-13AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 13).
2017-09-11AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3097.)
2017-09-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2462.).
2017-09-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-31SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-07-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-27SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-15SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1389.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19605Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19614Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback