CA AB46 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 660, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 3.4 (commencing with Section 8261) of Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Youth Empowerment Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 46 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB46 Luz Rivas et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 46 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 660, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 1.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4.).
2021-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-06-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 22).
2021-06-17SenateAction rescinded wherebythe bill was referred to the Com. on JUD.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O., HUMAN S. and JUD.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2021-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-04-15Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on HUM. S.)
2021-04-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1023.)
2021-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-04-02AssemblyMeasure version as amended on March 30 corrected.
2021-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and HUM. S.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8261Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#92AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#91AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#90ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46#89CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB46

Bill Comments

feedback