CA AB459 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11005.4 of, and to add Section 11005.8 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 12401 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: healthy and sustainable food.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11005.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11005.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10300.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 12401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |