CA AB459 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 188, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 188, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 6920) to Part 2 of Division 6 of the Elections Code, relating to presidential elections.
Title
Electoral college: interstate compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Ronald Calderon [D] | Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] |
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Jared Huffman [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Asm. Fiona Ma [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-07-14 - Assembly - AB 459 HILL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB459 Hill By DeSaulnier (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 459 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB459 Hill By DeSaulnier (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 459 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 188, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-08-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-25 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-07-14 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 2339.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 2339.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 15. Page 2340.). | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 1842.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1843.). | |
2011-06-28 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-06-08 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 1460.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 5100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6920 | New Code | See Bill Text |