CA AB457 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 109, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3084 and 3146 of the Civil Code, relating to liens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-07-13 - Assembly - AB 457 MONNING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-07-09 - Senate - Special Consent #12 AB457 Monning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - AB 457 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 109, Statutes of 2009.
2009-08-05 Approved by the Governor.
2009-07-30 Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2009-07-13 Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2471.)
2009-07-09 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-07-09 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1664.)
2009-07-02 Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
2009-06-23 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-06-22 Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
2009-06-18 Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-06-17 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
2009-05-11 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2009-04-30 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2009-04-20 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-04-20 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 975.)
2009-04-01 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-03-31 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 31).
2009-03-26 Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2009-03-25 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2009-03-12 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2009-02-25 From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
2009-02-24 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code3084Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code3146Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_457&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_bill_20090224_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_bill_20090325_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_bill_20090511_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_bill_20090618_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_bill_20090715_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_bill_20090806_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_vote_20090331_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_vote_20090420_1242PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_vote_20090609_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_vote_20090709_0950AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_vote_20090713_1231PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback