CA AB451 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hurtado.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hurtado.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1317 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health care facilities: treatment of psychiatric emergency medical conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 451 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 451 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hurtado. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1852.) |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |