CA AB450 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1797.112, 1797.172, 1797.185, 1797.194, 1798.200, 1798.210, and 1798.211 of, to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 1797.125) to Chapter 3 of Division 2.5 of, and to repeal Section 1798.204 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.
Title
Paramedic Disciplinary Review Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 450 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB450 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 450 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Emergency Management] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB450 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 450 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Emergency Management] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3075.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2580.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | From special consent calendar. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1602.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.M. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.M. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1797.112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.125 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.194 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1798.200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1798.204 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1798.210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1798.211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |