CA AB450 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 89036 of the Education Code, relating to the California State University.
Title
California State University: food service contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Felipe Fuentes [D] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] |
Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Juan Vargas [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-02 - Assembly - AB 450 WIECKOWSKI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB450 Wieckowski By Lowenthal (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 450 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB450 Wieckowski By Lowenthal (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 450 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2011-09-02 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2833.). | |
2011-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2125.). | |
2011-08-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 15). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-13 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1712.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-03 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-05-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12440.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |