CA AB45 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3.4 (commencing with Section 47120) of Chapter 1 of Part 7 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Household hazardous waste.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 45 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 3507.) |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 28). |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 47120 | New Code | See Bill Text |