CA AB448 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 64, 480.1, 480.2, and 482 of, and to add Sections 480.9, 486, 486.5, and 488 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: change in ownership.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2012-01-09 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-09-09 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-09-08 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 482 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 486 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 486.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 488 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |