CA AB446 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-09 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-09 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12920, 12921, 12927, 12930, 12931, 12955, 12955.8, 12956.1, 12956.2, and 12993 of the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: housing: victims of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 446 Choi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1769.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12927 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12955.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12993 | Amended Code | Citation Text |