CA AB444 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 117906 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Medical waste: home-generated medical waste.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 444 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1778.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 117904 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 117906 | New Code | See Bill Text |