CA AB44 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 3039 of, and to add Section 2023 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fur products.
Title
Fur products: prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 44 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB44 Friedman By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 44 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 44 Friedman Assembly Third Reading Amend By FRIEDMAN Set #1 (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB44 Friedman By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 44 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 44 Friedman Assembly Third Reading Amend By FRIEDMAN Set #1 (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 3392.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 2743.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 16. Page 2018.) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 1856.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (March 26). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (March 12). |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and JUD. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 3039 | Amended Code | Citation Text |