CA AB44 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 355, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 355, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3058.6 of the Penal Code, relating to inmates.
Title
Inmates: release: notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-25 - Assembly - AB 44 LOGUE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent #8 AB44 Logue By Gaines (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - AB 44 LOGUE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent #8 AB44 Logue By Gaines (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - AB 44 LOGUE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 355, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-25 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2548.). | |
2011-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2018.). | |
2011-08-17 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-04-25 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1037.) | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-24 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-23 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15). | |
2011-01-31 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-01-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3058.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |