CA AB438 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 124 of the Labor Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: workers' compensation: compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 438 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB438 Chiu By Pan (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 438 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB438 Chiu By Pan (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 438 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3056.). |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2642.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and L. & I.R. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 19. Page 1428.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 22). |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7292 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |