CA AB433 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.3 of the Penal Code, relating to probation.
Title
Probation: notice to victim.
Sponsors
Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB433 Ramos By Archuleta (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 433 Ramos Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 433 Ramos Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2442.). |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1563.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 26). |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |