CA AB433 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 103425, 103430, and 103435 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records.
Title
Birth certificates: issuance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-22 - Assembly - AB 433 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB433 Bonnie Lowenthal By Lieu (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Assembly - AB 433 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB433 Bonnie Lowenthal By Lieu (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Assembly - AB 433 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-22 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 2482.). | |
2011-07-14 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1848.). | |
2011-06-10 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 7). | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-05-05 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 1230.) | |
2011-03-30 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-29 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-03-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 22). | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 103425 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103435 | Amended Code | Citation Text |