CA AB430 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 65913.15 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing development: Camp Fire Housing Assistance Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 430 Gallagher Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB430 Gallagher et al. By Nielsen (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 430 Gallagher Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB430 Gallagher et al. By Nielsen (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 430 Gallagher Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3014.). |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 2454.). |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3). |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, EQ. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 1728.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 22). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65913.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |